Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Augustine Kandathil

Deceased

Archbishop of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1874BornChempu
21 Dec 190127.3Ordained PriestPriest of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabarese), India
29 Aug 191137.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabarese), India
29 Aug 191137.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Arad
3 Dec 191137.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arad
8 Dec 191945.3SucceededVicar Apostolic of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabarese), India
21 Dec 192349.3AppointedArchbishop of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabarese), India
11 Jan 195681.4DiedArchbishop of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Augustine Kandathil:
Archbishop Augustine Kandathil (born , died ) Archbishop of Ernakulam

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 44.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 63
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1911, Number 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013