Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ephrem Nariculam

Bishop of Chanda (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1960 BornNayarambalam
27 Dec 198626.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabarese), India
31 Jul 201453.6AppointedBishop of Chanda (Syro-Malabarese), India
24 Oct 201453.9Ordained BishopBishop of Chanda (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Ephrem Nariculam:
Bishop Ephrem Nariculam (born ) Bishop of Chanda

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Chanda (Syro-Malabarese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Jul 2014
  • bp: CB, 31 Jul 2014
  • ob: CB, 15 Aug 2014
  • c2+: CB, 1 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 2 Sep 2014