Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Kuriakose Bharanikulangara

Bishop of Faridabad (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1959 BornKarippassery
18 Dec 198324.9Ordained PriestPriest
6 Mar 201253.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Faridabad (Syro-Malabarese), India
26 May 201253.3Ordained BishopBishop of Faridabad (Syro-Malabarese), India
27 May 201253.3InstalledBishop of Faridabad (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Kuriakose Bharanikulangara:
Archbishop Kuriakose Bharanikulangara (born ) Bishop of Faridabad

Please contact the Archbishop through the Eparchy of Faridabad (Syro-Malabarese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Mar 2012
  • ob/c2+/i: CB, 4 May 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,439

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013