Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jose Puthenveettil

Auxiliary Bishop of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabarese)

Titular Bishop of Rusubbicari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1961 BornEdappally
26 Dec 198726.7Ordained PriestPriest of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabarese), India
23 Aug 201352.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabarese), India
23 Aug 201352.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusubbicari
21 Sep 201352.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusubbicari

MicroData Summary for Jose Puthenveettil:
Bishop Jose Puthenveettil (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ernakulam-Angamaly

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabarese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Aug 2013
  • ob/c2: CB, 24 Aug 2013
  • c34: CB, 28 Aug 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,880

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015