Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Chakiath

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabarese)

Titular Bishop of Uzippari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1937 BornKarukutty
1 Dec 196427.2Ordained PriestPriest of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabarese), India
19 Jan 199860.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabarese), India
19 Jan 199860.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Uzippari
14 Apr 199860.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uzippari
10 Sep 201275.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Thomas Chakiath:
Bishop Thomas Chakiath (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Ernakulam-Angamaly

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabarese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,318
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013