Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archeparchy of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar)

Changanacherrensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar)
20 May 1887ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Verapoly Vicariate Apostolic of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar) (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Trichur (Syro-Malabar) (erected)
28 July 1896Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar)
Vicariate Apostolic of Trichur (Syro-Malabar)
Vicariate Apostolic of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabar) (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar)
28 July 1896Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar) Vicariate Apostolic of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar)
29 August 1911Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar) Vicariate Apostolic of Kottayam (Syro-Malabar) (erected)
Eparchy of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar)
21 December 1923ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar) Eparchy of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar)
25 July 1950Territory LostEparchy of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar) (Palai, Muttuchira, Kuravilangatt, Anacallu, and Uamapuram) Diocese of Palai (Syro-Malabar) (erected)
29 April 1955Territory AddedEparchy of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar) (Quilon (except some of "taluk" Shenkotta, Pathanamthitta, Tiruvalla, and Ampalapuzha), Chirayinkit, Nedumangad, Trivandrum , Neyyatinkara, Thovala, Agasteeswaram, Kalkulam, and Vilavankode)
Archeparchy of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar)
29 July 1956ElevatedEparchy of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar) Archeparchy of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar)
26 February 1977Territory LostArcheparchy of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar) (Kanjirapally, Erumely, Mundakayam, Anakara, Kattapana, and Upputhara) Diocese of Kanjirapally (Syro-Malabar) (erected)
11 November 1996Territory LostArcheparchy of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar) (Kanyakumari and Shenkottai) Diocese of Thuckalay (Syro-Malabar) (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Eparchy of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar)
1950415,9252,000,00020.8%370124494841140789200ap1951
1959314,6914,561,9616.9%200952951,066128812147ap1960
Archeparchy of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar)
1970370,8199,376,0004.0%3191344538181821,976157ap1971
1980300,243261933548481101,682185ap1981
1990350,0001,715,00020.4%5804059853554872,074197ap1991
1999350,00012,600,0002.8%2883766645274442,690240ap2000
2000380,00013,000,0002.9%3002705706663292,872271ap2001
2001380,00013,000,0002.9%3022825846503493,000277ap2002
2002380,00013,000,0002.9%3072825896453432,901268ap2003
2003380,0009,300,0004.1%3212535746622922,787271ap2004
2004382,0009,300,0004.1%3322535856522922,810271ap2005
2006390,0009,394,0004.2%3003376376124612,720266ap2007
2009385,0009,430,0004.1%3203306505925752,700276ap2010
2013380,5059,297,0004.1%3383456835575972,655278ap2014
2016398,4009,516,2004.2%3523977495316503,293241ap2017
2019405,46010,038,6804.0%3944178114996992,374248ap2020
2021402,20010,249,8853.9%390604508933322,374248ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Eparchy of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar)
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 16, Page 257, to Page 262
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 47, Page 784, and Page 785
  • Archeparchy of Changanacherry (Syro-Malabar)
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 51, Page 580, and Page 581

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 1 Apr 2024