Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gratian Mundadan, C.M.I.

Bishop Emeritus of Bijnor (Syro-Malabar), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1933 Born
17 May 196431.0Ordained PriestPriest of Carmelites of Mary Immaculate
197238.6AppointedApostolic Exarch of Bijnor (Syro-Malabar), India
26 Feb 197743.7AppointedBishop of Bijnor (Syro-Malabar), India
6 Nov 197744.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bijnor (Syro-Malabar), India
14 Aug 200976.2RetiredBishop of Bijnor (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Gratian Mundadan
Bishop Gratian Mundadan C.M.I. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Bijnor

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlengad

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bijnor (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Aug 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast