Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacob Manathodath

Bishop of Palghat (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1947 BornKodamthuruth
4 Nov 197225.7Ordained PriestPriest of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabarese), India
6 Sep 199245.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabarese), India
6 Sep 199245.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Abydus
28 Nov 199245.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abydus
11 Nov 199649.7AppointedBishop of Palghat (Syro-Malabarese), India
1 Feb 199749.9InstalledBishop of Palghat (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Jacob Manathodath:
Bishop Jacob Manathodath (born ) Bishop of Palghat

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Palghat (Syro-Malabarese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,988
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 11 Jan 2014; data: 11 Jan 2014