Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthew Pothanamuzhi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kothamangalam (Syro-Malabar), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1903Born
2 Oct 193228.7Ordained PriestPriest of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabar), India
29 Jul 195652.6AppointedBishop of Kothamangalam (Syro-Malabar), India
18 Nov 195652.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kothamangalam (Syro-Malabar), India
26 Feb 197773.1RetiredBishop of Kothamangalam (Syro-Malabar), India
6 Feb 198278.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Kothamangalam (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Matthew Pothanamuzhi
Bishop Matthew Pothanamuzhi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kothamangalam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArakuzha

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1956, Number 103
  • opd/c1: CB, 9 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 9 May 2020

Quantcast