Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bosco Puthur

Bishop of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Melbourne (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1946 BornParappur
27 Mar 197124.8Ordained PriestPriest of Trichur (Syro-Malabarese), India
18 Jan 201063.6AppointedCurial Bishop of Ernakulam-Angamaly (Syro-Malabarese), India
18 Jan 201063.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Foratiana
13 Feb 201063.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Foratiana
23 Dec 201367.6SelectedBishop of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Melbourne (Syro-Malabarese), Australia
11 Jan 201467.6ConfirmedBishop of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Melbourne (Syro-Malabarese), Australia
25 Mar 201467.8InstalledBishop of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Melbourne (Syro-Malabarese), Australia

MicroData Summary for Bosco Puthur:
Bishop Bosco Puthur (born ) Bishop of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Melbourne

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Melbourne (Syro-Malabarese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,573
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Apr 2014