Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloysius Pareparambil (Pazheparambil)

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabarese)

Titular Bishop of Tium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1847BornPulincunnu
4 Dec 187023.7Ordained PriestPriest
11 Aug 189649.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabarese), India
11 Aug 189649.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tium
25 Oct 189649.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tium
8 Dec 191972.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Ernakulam (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Aloysius Pareparambil (Pazheparambil):
Bishop Aloysius Pareparambil (Pazheparambil) (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Ernakulam

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 552

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013