Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurent Guillon, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southern Manchuria {Manciuria Meridionale}

Titular Bishop of Eumenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1854BornChindrieux, France
1873¹18.1ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
23 Sep 187722.9Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
28 Dec 188935.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Manchuria {Manciuria}, China
28 Dec 188935.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Eumenia
25 May 189035.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eumenia
10 May 189843.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Manchuria {Manciuria Meridionale}, China
2 Jul 190045.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Southern Manchuria {Manciuria Meridionale}, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Laurent Guillon:
Bishop Laurent Guillon M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southern Manchuria {Manciuria Meridionale}

  • a priest for 22.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 265

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013