Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Marie Masson, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Colombo in Ceylon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1876BornLa Biolle, France
7 Jul 190125.2Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
14 Jun 193862.2AppointedArchbishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka
24 Aug 193862.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Colombo, Sri Lanka
28 Jul 194771.3DiedArchbishop of Colombo in Ceylon, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Masson:
Archbishop Jean-Marie Masson O.M.I. (born , died ) Archbishop of Colombo in Ceylon

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015