Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine Martinet

Deceased

Archbishop of Chambéry


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1766BornQueige
19 Sep 178923.4Ordained PriestPriest
20 Nov 182559.6SelectedBishop of Tarentaise, France
19 Dec 182559.7ConfirmedBishop of Tarentaise, France
19 Mar 182659.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tarentaise, France
20 Dec 182761.7SelectedArchbishop of Chambéry, France
28 Jan 182861.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Chambéry, France
6 May 183973.0DiedArchbishop of Chambéry, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine Martinet:
Archbishop Antoine Martinet (born , died ) Archbishop of Chambéry

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 148, and Page 358

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013