Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Baptiste Miège, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kansas, USA

Titular Bishop of Messene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1815Born
12 Sep 184428.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
19 Jul 185034.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Indian Territory East of the Rocky Mountains, USA
19 Jul 185034.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Messene
25 Mar 185135.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Messene
18 Nov 187459.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Kansas, USA
21 Jul 188468.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kansas, USA

MicroData Summary for John Baptiste Miège (VIAF: 74658820)
Bishop John Baptiste Miège S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kansas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlbertville, France
Ordained BishopSt. Francis Xavier, Saint Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 381
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017