Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Xaver Eder

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Passau, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1925Born
29 Jun 195428.6Ordained PriestPriest of Passau, Germany
6 May 197751.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Passau, Germany
6 May 197751.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Villa Regis
16 Jul 197751.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Villa Regis
26 Jan 198458.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Passau, Germany
15 Oct 198458.9SucceededBishop of Passau, Germany
8 Jan 200175.1RetiredBishop of Passau, Germany
20 Jun 201387.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Xaver Eder (VIAF: 5740272)
Bishop Franz Xaver Eder (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Passau

EventPlace
Birth PlacePfarrkirchen

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 21 Jun 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Mar 2017