Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Hlouch

Deceased

Bishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1902Born
5 Jul 192624.2Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 194745.2AppointedBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
15 Aug 194745.3Ordained BishopBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
10 Jun 197270.2DiedBishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Joseph Hlouch
Bishop Joseph Hlouch (born , died ) Bishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLipnik

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Mar 2017