Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maximilian Aichern, O.S.B.

Bishop Emeritus of Linz, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1932 Born
1 Mar 195522.1ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
9 Jul 195926.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Dec 198148.9AppointedBishop of Linz, Austria
17 Jan 198249.0Ordained BishopBishop of Linz, Austria
18 May 200572.3ResignedBishop of Linz, Austria

MicroData Summary for Maximilian Aichern (VIAF: 45232904)
Bishop Maximilian Aichern O.S.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Linz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWien

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Linz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Mar 2017