Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pavel Posád

Auxiliary Bishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic

Titular Bishop of Poetovium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1953 Born
26 Jun 197723.9Ordained PriestPriest of Brno, Czech Republic
24 Dec 200350.4AppointedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
28 Feb 200450.6Ordained BishopBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
26 Jan 200854.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}, Czech Republic
26 Jan 200854.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Poetovium

MicroData Summary for Pavel Posád
Bishop Pavel Posád (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBudkov

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of České Budĕjovice {Budweis}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Jan 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,540
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast