Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Matocha

Deceased

Archbishop of Olomouc


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1888BornPitin
15 Aug 191426.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Mar 194859.9AppointedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
2 May 194860.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
3 Nov 196173.5DiedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Joseph Matocha:
Archbishop Joseph Matocha (born , died ) Archbishop of Olomouc

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013