Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Mani Giles Pothanamuzhy, C.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mananthavady (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1932BornNadukkara
1 Dec 196432.3Ordained PriestPriest of Carmelites of Mary Immaculate
11 Nov 199664.3AppointedBishop of Mananthavady (Syro-Malabarese), India
26 Jan 199764.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mananthavady (Syro-Malabarese), India
6 Apr 200370.7DiedBishop of Mananthavady (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Mani Giles Pothanamuzhy:
Bishop Emmanuel Mani Giles Pothanamuzhy C.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Mananthavady

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,912
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013