Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Thuruthimattam, C.S.T.

Bishop of Gorakhpur (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1947 BornAryvikuzhy
21 Dec 197326.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Saint Theresa of the Child Jesus “Little Flower”
2003²55.6AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of Saint Theresa of the Child Jesus “Little Flower”
15 Jul 200659.2AppointedBishop of Gorakhpur (Syro-Malabarese), India
1 Oct 200659.4Ordained BishopBishop of Gorakhpur (Syro-Malabarese), India

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Thuruthimattam:
Bishop Thomas Thuruthimattam C.S.T. (born ) Bishop of Gorakhpur

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gorakhpur (Syro-Malabarese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Number 15,271
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015