Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacob Angadiath

Bishop of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Chicago (Syro-Malabar), Illinois, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1945 Born
5 Jan 197226.2Ordained PriestPriest of Palai (Syro-Malabar), India
13 Mar 200155.4AppointedBishop of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Chicago (Syro-Malabar), Illinois, USA
1 Jul 200155.7Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Chicago (Syro-Malabar), Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Jacob Angadiath
Bishop Jacob Angadiath (born ) Bishop of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Chicago

EventPlace
Birth PlacePeriappuram

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Saint Thomas the Apostle of Chicago (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,998

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast