Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Chirayath

Bishop of Sagar (Syro-Malabarese)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1941 BornAranattukara
2 Jan 197028.4Ordained PriestPriest of Sagar (Syro-Malabarese), India
2 Feb 200664.5AppointedBishop of Sagar (Syro-Malabarese), India
25 Mar 200664.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sagar (Syro-Malabarese), India

MicroData Summary for Anthony Chirayath:
Bishop Anthony Chirayath (born ) Bishop of Sagar

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sagar (Syro-Malabarese).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,098
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013