Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthew Vaniakizhakel, C.V.

Bishop Emeritus of Satna (Syro-Malabar), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1945 Born
18 Dec 197226.9Ordained PriestPriest of Vincentian Congregation (Syro-Malabar)
18 Dec 199953.9AppointedBishop of Satna (Syro-Malabar), India
12 Apr 200054.3Ordained BishopBishop of Satna (Syro-Malabar), India
27 Aug 201468.6ResignedBishop of Satna (Syro-Malabar), India

MicroData Summary for Matthew Vaniakizhakel
Bishop Matthew Vaniakizhakel C.V. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Satna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKaithappara

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Satna (Syro-Malabar).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,747
  • c56: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Aug 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018