Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Valenti Gonzaga

Deceased

Librarian of the Vatican Library

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1725BornRoveredo, Italy
24 Jun 176438.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Jun 176438.7Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jul 176438.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia
25 Jul 176438.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia
18 Aug 176438.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
28 Aug 177347.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
Nov 1773³48.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
15 Apr 177650.5Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
20 May 177650.5Elevated to Cardinal
Jan 177852.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
30 Mar 177852.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura
1788²62.2AppointedPrefect to Other
29 Nov 179065.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
1793²67.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Ecclesiastical Immunity
1 Jun 179569.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
Dec 1800³75.1ResignedPrefect of the Congregation of Ecclesiastical Immunity
12 Jan 180276.2AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
3 Aug 180781.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
29 Dec 180883.2DiedLibrarian of the Vatican Library

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Valenti Gonzaga (VIAF: 89090298)
Luigi Cardinal Valenti Gonzaga (born , died ) Librarian of Vatican Library

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 44.4 years
  • a cardinal for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Apr 1776
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1764, Number 25
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 266

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016