Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Filippo Sardi

Deceased

Archbishop of Lucca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1736BornLucca
22 Dec 175923.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 178952.8AppointedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
16 Aug 178952.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
8 Mar 182689.4DiedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Sardi:
Archbishop Filippo Sardi (born , died ) Archbishop of Lucca

  • a priest for 66.2 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013