Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pasquale Petruccelli

Deceased

Bishop of Strongoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1728³BornCastelfranco
23 Sep 175224.1Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 179264.3SelectedBishop of Strongoli, Italy
17 Jun 179364.8ConfirmedBishop of Strongoli, Italy
23 Jun 179364.8Ordained BishopBishop of Strongoli, Italy
16 Dec 179870.3DiedBishop of Strongoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pasquale Petruccelli
Bishop Pasquale Petruccelli (born , died ) Bishop of Strongoli

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 387
  • c34: CB, 14 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1793, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 22 Feb 2016