Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Rovelli, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Como


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1740BornComo
17 Dec 176323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
31 Jan 179352.1SelectedBishop of Como, Italy
17 Jun 179352.5ConfirmedBishop of Como, Italy
23 Jun 179352.5Ordained BishopBishop of Como, Italy
1 Oct 181978.7ResignedBishop of Como, Italy
3 Dec 181978.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Como, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Rovelli
Bishop Carlo Rovelli O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Como

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 176
  • c34: CB, 14 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1793, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 24 Feb 2016