Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fortunado Pinto

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno (-Acerno)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1740BornSalerno
24 Sep 176323.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 179151.2SelectedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
27 Feb 179251.4ConfirmedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
4 Mar 179251.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tricarico, Italy
Feb 1805³64.4SelectedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
26 Jun 180564.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
20 Nov 182585.2DiedArchbishop of Salerno (-Acerno), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fortunado Pinto
Archbishop Fortunado Pinto (born , died ) Archbishop of Salerno (-Acerno)

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 329
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 14
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 415

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016