Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mihajlo Mate Spalatin

Deceased

Bishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1736Born
10 Mar 175923.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Sep 179458.5AppointedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
21 Sep 179458.5Ordained BishopBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
27 Jun 179660.3AppointedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
13 Mar 180771.0DiedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Mihajlo Mate Spalatin
Bishop Mihajlo Mate Spalatin (born , died ) Bishop of Šibenik (Knin)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArbe

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 156, and Page 379
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1794, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast