Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Paolo Perremuto, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Messina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1732BornCaltagirone
21 Dec 175422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
29 Mar 179058.2AppointedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
6 Apr 179058.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Messina, Italy
11 Mar 179159.2DiedArchbishop of Messina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Paolo Perremuto:
Archbishop Francesco Paolo Perremuto O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Messina

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013