Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Andrea Avogadro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Verona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1735BornVenezia
29 Sep 176327.9Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 179054.4AppointedBishop of Verona, Italy
6 Apr 179054.4Ordained BishopBishop of Verona, Italy
14 Nov 180570.0ResignedBishop of Verona, Italy
1 Feb 181579.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Verona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Andrea Avogadro:
Bishop Giovanni Andrea Avogadro (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Verona

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 439

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013