Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of Veroli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1738BornStellata
28 Dec 176830.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
31 Dec 176830.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 Apr 178547.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
22 May 178547.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
18 Dec 178648.8AppointedBishop of Veroli, Italy
May 1811³73.2DiedBishop of Veroli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Rossi:
Bishop Antonio Rossi (born , died May 1811) Bishop of Veroli

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1806
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 174, and Page 210
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 439
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,024
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1785, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016