Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carmine Fimiani

Deceased

Bishop of Nard˛


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1740BornCastel San Giorgio
16 Jun 176424.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 179251.9SelectedBishop of Nard˛, Italy
27 Feb 179252.0ConfirmedBishop of Nard˛, Italy
4 Mar 179252.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nard˛, Italy
13 Nov 179959.7DiedBishop of Nard˛, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carmine Fimiani
Bishop Carmine Fimiani (born , died ) Bishop of Nard˛

  • a priest for 35.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 307
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1792, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016