Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Vecchi

Deceased

Bishop of Teano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1749BornFalco
6 Mar 177324.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 179142.8SelectedBishop of Conversano, Italy
27 Feb 179243.0ConfirmedBishop of Conversano, Italy
4 Mar 179243.0Ordained BishopBishop of Conversano, Italy
24 Oct 179748.7SelectedBishop of Teano, Italy
18 Dec 179748.8ConfirmedBishop of Teano, Italy
180858.8DiedBishop of Teano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Vecchi
Bishop Nicola Vecchi (born , died 1808) Bishop of Teano

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 181, and Page 399
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016