Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Pasca, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Teano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1728³BornMagliano Vecchio
3 Jun 174416.0ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
29 Jul 175123.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
20 Jan 179263.6SelectedBishop of Teano, Italy
26 Mar 179263.8ConfirmedBishop of Teano, Italy
9 Apr 179263.8Ordained BishopBishop of Teano, Italy
1795¹66.5DiedBishop of Teano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Pasca
Bishop Raffaele Pasca O.S.B. (born , died 1795) Bishop of Teano

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 38
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 399

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016