Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Livizzani Forni

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1722BornModena, Italy
14 Feb 178562.3Elevated to Cardinal
11 Apr 178562.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
14 May 178562.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
21 Feb 179471.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
13 Apr 179471.4Ordained PriestPriest of San Silvestro in Capite
1 Jul 180279.7DiedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite

MicroData Summary for Carlo Livizzani Forni:
Cardinal Carlo Livizzani Forni (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite

  • a priest for 8.2 years
  • a cardinal for 17.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Feb 1785

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013