Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Victor Léon Jean Pierre Marie Bazin, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Rangoon, Myanmar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1905Born
22 Sep 192823.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of La Société des Missions Etrangères
23 Feb 192924.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
7 May 195348.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Rangoon, Myanmar
7 May 195348.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Achyraus
18 Oct 195348.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Achyraus
1 Jan 195549.9AppointedArchbishop of Rangoon, Myanmar
19 Jun 197166.4ResignedArchbishop of Rangoon, Myanmar
26 Jan 197570.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Rangoon, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Victor Léon Jean Pierre Marie Bazin
Archbishop Victor Léon Jean Pierre Marie Bazin M.E.P. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Rangoon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Brieuc-de-Mauron, Diocese of Vannes, France
Ordained DeaconForeign Missions, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestForeign Missions, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopRangoon, Vicariate Apostolic of Rangoon
Death PlaceSaint-Brieuc-de-Mauron, Diocese of Vannes, France

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 5 Jul 2018

Quantcast