Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Marie V Duy Nht

Deceased

Bishop of Bi Chu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1911BornSa-Chu
27 Nov 196049.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bi Chu, Viet Nam
4 Jul 197967.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bi Chu, Viet Nam
8 Aug 197967.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Bi Chu, Viet Nam
12 Mar 198775.3SucceededBishop of Bi Chu, Viet Nam
11 Dec 199988.1DiedBishop of Bi Chu, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Marie V Duy Nht:
Bishop Joseph-Marie V Duy Nht (born , died ) Bishop of Bi Chu

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,043
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013