Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Nguyễn Văn Yến

Bishop Emeritus of Pht Diệm, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1942 Born
26 Jun 197734.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Nov 198845.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Pht Diệm, Viet Nam
16 Dec 198845.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Pht Diệm, Viet Nam
3 Nov 199855.8SucceededBishop of Pht Diệm, Viet Nam
14 Apr 200764.3ResignedBishop of Pht Diệm, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Nguyễn Văn Yến
Bishop Joseph Nguyễn Văn Yến (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Pht Diệm

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVinh Tri

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pht Diệm.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Apr 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,131
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,047

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 6 Apr 2020

Quantcast