Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Octave-Marie Terrienne, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Gilbert Islands {Isole Gilbert}, Kiribati

Titular Bishop of Menelaites


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1902BornBouvron, France
27 Jan 192926.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
2 Dec 193735.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Gilbert Islands {Isole Gilbert}, Kiribati, Pacific (Oceania)
2 Dec 193735.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Menelaites
25 Jun 193835.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Menelaites
28 Feb 196158.4ResignedVicar Apostolic of Gilbert Islands {Isole Gilbert}, Kiribati, Pacific (Oceania)
4 Mar 199491.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Gilbert Islands {Isole Gilbert}, Kiribati, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Octave-Marie Terrienne:
Bishop Octave-Marie Terrienne M.S.C. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Gilbert Islands {Isole Gilbert}

  • a priest for 65.1 years
  • a bishop for 55.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015