Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Auguste-Joseph-Marie Cogneau

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)

Titular Bishop of Thabraca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1868BornQuimper
10 Aug 189123.3Ordained PriestPriest of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
23 Jun 193365.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
23 Jun 193365.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thabraca
24 Aug 193365.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thabraca
8 May 194678.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
12 Apr 195284.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France

MicroData Summary for Auguste-Joseph-Marie Cogneau:
Bishop Auguste-Joseph-Marie Cogneau (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015