Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Javier Salinas Viñals

Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia

Titular Bishop of Forum Clodii


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1948 BornValencia
23 Jun 197426.4Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia, Spain
26 May 199244.3AppointedBishop of Ibiza, Spain
6 Sep 199244.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ibiza, Spain
5 Sep 199749.6AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
16 Nov 201264.8AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
12 Jan 201364.9InstalledBishop of Mallorca, Spain
8 Sep 201668.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
8 Sep 201668.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Forum Clodii

MicroData Summary for Javier Salinas Viñals
Bishop Javier Salinas Viñals (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Valencia

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Valencia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,923
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Nov 2012
  • i: CB, 20 Nov 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 8 Sep 2016