Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Ceballos Atienza

Bishop Emeritus of Cádiz y Ceuta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1935 BornAlcalá la Real
29 Jun 196125.9Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jan 198852.4AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
25 Mar 198852.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
10 Dec 199358.4AppointedBishop of Cádiz y Ceuta, Spain
30 Aug 201176.1RetiredBishop of Cádiz y Ceuta, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Ceballos Atienza:
Bishop Antonio Ceballos Atienza (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Cádiz y Ceuta

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cádiz y Ceuta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,618
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Aug 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013