Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Quinteiro Fiuza

Bishop of Tui-Vigo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1947 Born
27 Jun 197124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
23 Apr 199951.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
23 Apr 199951.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Fuerteventura
19 Jun 199951.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fuerteventura
3 Aug 200255.1AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
28 Jan 201062.5AppointedBishop of Tui-Vigo, Spain
24 Apr 201062.8InstalledBishop of Tui-Vigo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Luis Quinteiro Fiuza
Bishop Luis Quinteiro Fiuza (born ) Bishop of Tui-Vigo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVila de Cruces

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tui-Vigo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,569

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast