Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Ureña Pastor

Archbishop Emeritus of Zaragoza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1945 BornAlbaida
14 Jul 197328.4Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jul 198843.3AppointedBishop of Ibiza, Spain
11 Sep 198843.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ibiza, Spain
23 Jul 199146.4AppointedBishop of Alcalá de Henares, Spain
1 Jul 199853.3AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
2 Apr 200560.1AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
12 Nov 201469.7ResignedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Ureña Pastor:
Archbishop Manuel Ureña Pastor (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Zaragoza

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Zaragoza.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,918
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 12 Nov 2014