Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Santiago Martínez Acebes

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Burgos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1926BornSan Cristóbal de la Polantera
30 Jul 195024.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jan 198861.5AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
6 Mar 198861.6Ordained BishopBishop of Plasencia, Spain
30 Oct 199266.3AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
28 Mar 200275.7RetiredArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
25 Nov 200680.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Santiago Martínez Acebes:
Archbishop Santiago Martínez Acebes (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Burgos

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,531
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013