Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Higinio Gómez González, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lugo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1932Born
24 Jun 195624.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
23 Apr 198048.0AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
28 Jun 198048.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
30 Nov 200775.6RetiredBishop of Lugo, Spain
8 Jan 200875.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Lugo, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Higinio Gómez González
Bishop José Higinio Gómez González O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lugo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLalín
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lugo, Diocese of Lugo

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2007
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 71, Number 5,671

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast