Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Ramón Santos Iztueta Mendizábal, C.P. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Moyobamba, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1929Born
26 May 194617.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Passion
29 Mar 195222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
30 May 199869.1AppointedCoadjutor Prelate of Moyobamba, Peru
3 Jul 199869.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Prelate of Moyobamba, Peru
6 Jun 200071.1SucceededPrelate of Moyobamba, Peru
21 Jul 200778.2RetiredPrelate of Moyobamba, Peru
27 Aug 200778.3DiedPrelate Emeritus of Moyobamba, Peru

MicroData Summary for José Ramón Santos Iztueta Mendizábal
Bishop José Ramón Santos Iztueta Mendizábal C.P. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Moyobamba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Sebastian, Spain

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Jul 2007
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,352
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast